Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF ASCOT CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1092176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £29.42k £8.11k £32.82k £28.99k £11.00k
Total expenditure £31.74k £11.83k £40.27k £26.08k £11.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £300 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £300 N/A