THE TRINITY FOUNDATION PROGRAMME (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity shall be to further the education of students by providing foundation and other courses at the University of Dublin Trinity College and the University of Wales, Bangor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
- Ireland
Governance
- 19 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HISAE Driver | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT C M DRIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KUMI SUNADA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.97k | £73.58k | £107.47k | £106.54k | £126.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300.44k | £65.71k | £113.93k | £97.04k | £106.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.47k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.00k | £16.51k | £17.47k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 356 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 3 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS BY PROVIDING FOUNDATION AND OTHER COURSES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF DUBLIN TRINITY COLLEGE AND THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES BANGOR
Area of benefit
STUDENTS FROM ANY PART OF THE WORLD ATTENDING COURSES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF DUBLIN AND THE UNIVERSITY OF WALES BANGOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
51-52 HIGH STREET
BANGOR
GWYNEDD
LL57 1NR
- Phone:
- 01248362475
- Email:
- admin@trinity-foundation.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window