AUTISM ASSIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 July 2002: Standard registration
- 05 September 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482 | |
|
Total expenditure | £703 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 13 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM AUTISM AND RELATED DEVELOPMENT DIFFICULTIES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE FAMILIES CARING FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE, WEST MIDLANDS, DEVON, STAFFORDSHIRE AND BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window