ST MATTHEWS COMMUNITY HALLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES A WARM, WELCOMING ENVIRONMENT WITH QUALITY FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND IN DOING SO ALLOWS OUR COMMUNITY USERS TO FLOURISH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Waring Knill-Jones | Chair | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hetherington | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Richardson | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Robinson | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robson | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain McNicol | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE CULLEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
COLIN BENTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.71k | £22.42k | £34.29k | £29.06k | £38.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.71k | £17.21k | £16.31k | £29.63k | £54.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BARROW IN FURNESS ST MATTHEW IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BARROW IN FURNESS, ST MATTHEWS IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHFIELD ROAD
BARROW IN FURNESS
LA14 5PA
- Phone:
- 01229871234
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window