Financial history BUD FLANAGAN LEUKAEMIA FUND LIMITED

Charity number: 1092540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.44k £9.15k £29.41k £25.00k £24.65k
Total expenditure £47.68k £20.45k £24.80k £16.00k £28.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A