GAMBIA LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in the Gambia in particular through the provision of equipment and facilities not provided for through statutory funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- The Gambia
Governance
- 16 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Williams | Chair | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bubacarr Dampha | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vienna Read | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jagger | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Heather Leythorne | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.37k | £5.37k | £6.10k | £5.87k | £3.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.52k | £5.63k | £5.79k | £6.07k | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2025 | 652 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2025 | 1017 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1478 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE GAMBIA IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NOT PROVIDED FOR FROM STATUTORY FUNDS.
Area of benefit
GAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 CRELAKE CLOSE
Tavistock
PL19 9AX
- Phone:
- 07455018319
- Email:
- gambianprojects@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window