GURU NANAK INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activity is that of advancement of education and provide financial assistance to deserving students and educational establishments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 30 May 2002: Standard registration
- GURU NANAK INTERNATIONAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- GURU NANAK CHAIR TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baljinder Singh Panesar | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HERDEEP SINGH | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|||||
RANJIT SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.36k | £8.23k | £6.46k | £4.41k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £4.57k | £2.72k | £3.52k | £2.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 21ST FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS (THE "OBJECTS"). THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Loughton Business Centre
Langston Road
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 3FL
- Phone:
- 02085325959
- Email:
- ranjit@rkgrouplondon.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window