Governing document LEARNING NEVER STOPS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEB 2002 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2002 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 02 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ADULT POPULATION IN COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: (A) ADVISING ON AND, AS APPROPRIATE, ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES TO ENABLE BETTER ACCESS FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH DISABILITIES TO EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. (B) PROMOTING EDUCATION AT ALL LEVELS AND (C) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE FACTORS WHICH AFFECT THE TAKE-UP OF FURTHER EDUCATION AMONG ADULTS.
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.