Financial history Ivison Trust

Charity number: 1092560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £593.80k £771.27k £829.44k £852.90k £872.96k
Total expenditure £650.81k £672.80k £763.47k £835.40k £890.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £122.00k £383.79k N/A
Income from government grants £207.19k £305.74k £132.08k N/A £470.09k
Income - Donations and legacies £187.73k £202.46k £204.36k £166.34k £148.92k
Income - Other trading activities £72.85k £78.49k £102.46k £176.24k £116.80k
Income - Charitable activities £332.88k £490.12k £522.57k £509.83k £607.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £336 £198 £55 £491 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £606.99k £628.38k £707.25k £775.90k £890.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £43.82k £44.42k £56.22k £59.50k £0
Expenditure - Governance £17.91k £21.39k £14.64k £18.95k £23.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0