FRIENDS OF CASTLE PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1092871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for school activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £8,424
Total expenditure: £7,777

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SANDYLANE INFANTS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eleanor Robertson Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
Hannah Elizabeth Taylor Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Debra Richards Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Nicola Miller Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Lee-Emma Roberts Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.03k £4.08k £4.89k £6.48k £8.42k
Total expenditure £2.97k £3.58k £2.60k £4.40k £7.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Castle Park Primary School
Church Road
CALDICOT
Gwent
NP26 4HN
Phone:
01291 420465
Website:

No information available