Financial history THE PLOUGH ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1093715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £748.14k £533.40k £476.68k £470.69k £605.61k
Total expenditure £710.66k £369.50k £582.17k £597.81k £668.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £120.00k
Income from government grants £93.97k £290.21k £70.63k £25.00k £120.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £315.89k £337.04k N/A N/A £247.40k
Income - Other trading activities £29.02k £5.75k N/A N/A £58.51k
Income - Charitable activities £380.09k £51.17k N/A N/A £296.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £493 £211 N/A N/A £3.68k
Income - Other £22.65k £139.22k N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £682.91k £230.32k N/A N/A £465.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.76k £10.43k N/A N/A £10.20k
Expenditure - Governance £9.32k £8.61k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £257 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £128.75k N/A N/A £193.15k