Financial history IYIMV

Charity number: 1092322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £488.45k £356.10k £394.85k £339.53k £436.32k
Total expenditure £473.27k £402.48k £408.43k £426.69k £464.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k £40.83k N/A N/A