Financial history SUNDERLAND VOLUNTARY SECTOR YOUTH FORUM

Charity number: 1094142
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £238.47k £221.48k £218.46k £91.55k £26.37k
Total expenditure £183.43k £218.79k £218.79k £102.51k £102.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A