LLANDAFF NORTH GOSPEL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and upkeep of a place of worship Carrying on of religious services, prayer meetings, lectures and seminars Public celebration of Christian festivals Publication & distribution of Christian literature or messages of an evangelistic & teaching nature Encourage fostering and support of missionary work in UK & overseas Carrying on evangelical work by provision of facilities & resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 15 December 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Thomas | Chair |
|
||||||
PETER HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER JOHN BRIND OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.99k | £12.88k | £15.82k | £13.89k | £24.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.52k | £10.08k | £13.97k | £9.96k | £16.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LLANDAFF NORTH AREA OF CARDIFF PARTICULARLY BY; A) THE PROVISION AND UPKEEP OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP ("THE PLACE OF WORSHIP") B) THE CARRYING ON OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES, PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND SEMINARS C) THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS D) THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE OR MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE E) THE ENCOURAGEMENT, FOSTERING AND SUPPORT OF MISSIONARY WORK IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS BY PRAYER, PERSONAL EFFORT AND GIVING F) THE CARRYING ON OF EVANGELICAL WORK BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES FOR THE SAME
Area of benefit
LLANDAFF NORTH AREA OF CARDIFF
Contact information
- Address:
-
LLANDAFF NORTH GOSPEL HALL
BRIDGE ROAD
LLANDAFF NORTH
CARDIFF
CF14 2JL
- Phone:
- 02920006552
- Email:
- info@lncc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window