SKEGNESS DAY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE DAY CARE FOR THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED, PROVIDE A DOOR-TO-DOOR SERVICE, COLLECTING CLIENTS TO AND FROM THEIR HOMES AND BRINGING THEM TO THE DAY CENTRE TO BENEFIT FROM THE FACILITIES OFFERED. PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OR RECREATION OR OTHER SOCIAL LEISURETIME ACTIVITIES, IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,580 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Barry | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Tina Hill | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hayes | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Perera | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul McCooey | Trustee | 03 February 2016 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ALLEN | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.61k | £126.59k | £78.52k | £210.43k | £80.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.55k | £168.09k | £143.17k | £144.45k | £143.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.06k | N/A | £10.97k | £10.20k | £9.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £104.28k | £28.78k | £10.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MULTI-PURPOSE DAY CENTRE FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY, HOUSEBOUND AND DISABLED PERSONS OF SKEGNESS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND TO MAKE AVAILABLE THEREIN FACILITIES FOR THE SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS TO PROVIDE MEALS AND REFRESHMENTS FOR SUCH PERSONS IN NEED WHETHER FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE AND FOR SUCH OTHER OBJECTS FOR THE WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS AS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT TO AND FROM THE DAY CENTRE AND TRANSPORT PROVIDING RECREATION AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
SKEGNESS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SKEGNESS DAY CENTRE
DOROTHY AVENUE
SKEGNESS
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE25 2BS
- Phone:
- 01754766763
- Email:
- skegdc@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window