TROCAIRE AND CAFOD PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 2002: Standard registration
- 17 February 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2004 | 28/02/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £9.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19m | £2.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 16 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | 13 July 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | 15 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | 15 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 21ST FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO: 1. RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; 2. ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; 3. RELIEVE AND PREVENT SICKNESS, DISEASE AND PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; AND 4. PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window