Trustees MEADOWDALE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1093219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Lillie Chair 27 September 2023
None on record
Nicolas Hawke Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Matt Tilson Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Gemma Thakrar Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Helen Wilcox Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Joanne Roberts Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Sarah McLeod Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record