MEMPHIS TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 2002: Standard registration
- 22 July 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 July 2008: Funds transferred to 1121780 PENNY TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2005 | 28/02/2006 | 28/02/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £2.82k | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.73k | £2.83k | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 10 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | 18 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | 18 January 2007 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 30 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | 07 January 2005 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 7TH FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND PHOTOGRAPHY AND OF AGRICULTURAL HISTORY."
Area of benefit
NATIONA AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window