SAFE AND SOUND GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to keep people safe from exploitation, sexual violence and abuse, by: - Supporting those affected by child sexual exploitation, enabling them to move to a place of safety; - Providing training and resources to facilitate the identification and support of victims of exploitation and abuse; - Influencing change, by using our knowledge and experience to transform policy and opinion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £245,000 from 9 government grant(s)
People

20 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 2002: Standard registration
- KEY TO THE EDGE (Previous name)
- SAFE AND SOUND DERBY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark David Richardson | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Russell Steven Lipscombe | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Pugh | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Laura Richmond | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lloyd Buss | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SONIA FRANCESCA RAFFERTY | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAME SCOTT GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £457.27k | £496.57k | £736.45k | £791.97k | £809.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £476.27k | £355.80k | £601.60k | £682.84k | £733.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £117.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £117.04k | £218.35k | £206.34k | £245.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £54.08k | £106.32k | £134.26k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £457.71k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £5.90k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £416 | £1.77k | £10.15k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £567.26k | £649.06k | £704.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £34.34k | £33.78k | £29.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £13.09k | £10.47k | £10.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £9.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £21.04k | £20.00k | £17.21k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £512.32k | £697.57k | £765.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £113.74k | £188.81k | £177.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
East Mill
Darley Abbey Mills
DERBY
- Phone:
- 01332362120
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window