Financial history HASTINGS AND BEXHILL MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1092206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.04m £1.01m £968.86k £1.20m £1.54m
Total expenditure £912.28k £828.35k £891.95k £1.03m £1.25m
Income from government contracts £713.86k £644.99k £554.55k £828.63k £1.00m
Income from government grants £1.73k £153.31k £87.97k £522 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £52.24k £234.15k £113.61k £65.75k £107.35k
Income - Other trading activities £61.69k £14.46k £56.13k £0 £73.64k
Income - Charitable activities £917.08k £763.82k £797.24k £1.06m £1.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.00k £1.12k £1.58k £5.64k £7.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £300 £76.81k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £21.78k £0 £10.09k £8.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £895.79k £817.70k £879.98k £682.37k £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.49k £10.65k £11.97k £41.20k £57.07k
Expenditure - Governance £3.36k £3.36k £3.36k £4.00k £5.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £308.86k £0