THE WILLOWS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote relations between parents and teachers in everything pertaining to the well-being of the school and it's pupils. To afford opportunities for the study and discussion of all matters relating to the education and welfare of children. To facilitate the above by organising social, educational and fund-raising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 July 2002: Standard registration
- THE WILLOWS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- THE WILLOWS SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
louise Clarke | Chair | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Newitt | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Shuker | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hughes | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.57k | £8.21k | £5.15k | £7.98k | £19.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.51k | £8.86k | £3.69k | £8.96k | £9.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 March 2023 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
THE WILLOWS CE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREASURER
C/OHoly trinity primary school
THE WILLOWS NORTH
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
WARWICKSHIRE
CV37 9QN
- Phone:
- 01789295811
- Email:
- admin3204@we-learn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window