Financial history ALL SAINTS COMMUNITY CENTRE (SOUTH KIRKBY)

Charity number: 1097021
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £17.81k £15.71k £16.21k £3.24k £0
Total expenditure £21.65k £19.14k £21.01k £19.10k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0