9 Lives Furniture

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims and objectives are to help residents of Watford, Three Rivers and surrounding areas who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by the provision of furniture and accessories and to provide vocational training, support and work experience for those who volunteer at the scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 February 2003: Standard registration
- 13 May 2022: Funds received from 1025388 ROTARY CLUB OF RICKMANSWORTH TRUST FUND
- NINE LIVES FURNITURE (Working name)
- WATFORD AND THREE RIVERS FURNITURE RE-CYCLING SCHEME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sharpe | Chair | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Montesdeoca | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Louise Sutcliffe | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Donald Mclean Milligan | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Redington | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Sergio Giovanni Mussi | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blatherwick | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH HADFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRVIN MILTON COHEN FCA FABRP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.76k | £155.18k | £130.91k | £104.20k | £128.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.09k | £109.32k | £115.47k | £124.59k | £142.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.31k | £7.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 2002 as amended on 05 Jun 2020 as amended on 11 Mar 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN WATFORD, THREE RIVERS AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND ACCESSORIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING, SUPPORT AND WORK EXPERIENCE FOR UNEMPLOYED PERSONS WHO VOLUNTEER AT THE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
WATFORD, THREE RIVERS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 WHARF LANE
RICKMANSWORTH
HERTFORDSHIRE
WD3 1HA
- Phone:
- 01923 718666
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window