Accounts and annual returns THE EDINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1099266
Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 22 May 2024 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 17 May 2024 444 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 March 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 April 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required