Financial history PERFORMANCE II

Charity number: 1098768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £321 £680 £600 £0
Total expenditure £3.94k £187 £2.19k £2.06k £199
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A