CHURCHES TOGETHER IN WILLENHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity leads cooperative working between eleven churches in Willenhall, Walsall. Our major activity, involving more than 90% of our finances, is the running of a community resource centre in the shopping area of our town. We provide various forms of help and support to any in the community, including signposting, debt and money advice, bereavement support, advocacy and a listening ear.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Walsall
Governance
- 25 September 2002: Standard registration
- BRIDGING THE GAP (Working name)
- CTIW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER FREDERICK WILCOX | Chair | 13 December 2013 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Leslie Ward | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Kerene Mckeown | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Joy Wilcox | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Kathryn MacMahon | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.70k | £39.89k | £32.24k | £32.08k | £45.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.62k | £28.20k | £25.05k | £33.08k | £45.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.63k | £9.67k | £224 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JANUARY 2002, AS AMENDED 5 SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
1 TO SPREAD AND INCREASE THE KNOWLEDGE OF CHRISTIANITY IN AND AROUND THE WILLENHALL AREA 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS FOR THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, SICKNESS OR SOCIAL ISOLATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AND SIGNPOSTING TOWARDS ADVICE, INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
WILLENHALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 JOHN RILEY DRIVE
WILLENHALL
WV12 5AS
- Phone:
- 01922478489
- Email:
- ctiw.whall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window