Financial history ISLAND CONSERVATION SOCIETY UK

Charity number: 1103702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.88k £83.21k £80.09k £83.01k £151.17k
Total expenditure £64.36k £63.36k £70.85k £91.93k £178.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A