TOWNSEND YOUTH PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enable the provision of positive activities, informal social & citizenship education and basic welfare to Children & Young People on the Townsend Estate, so that they can fufil their potential and not be dis-advantaged by their poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 30 July 2002: Standard registration
- 09 March 2018: Funds received from 1157615 TOWNSEND CHILDREN'S PROJECT
- TOWNSEND YOUTH CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bruce Viney | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Thomas Southgate | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Dobbins | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Petrauskas | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Simonm Potterton | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Elms | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Bournemouth Young Men's Christian Association | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 September 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.95k | £63.19k | £60.11k | £62.92k | £43.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.09k | £95.18k | £72.27k | £59.29k | £50.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £47.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE ENTITLED TO MEMBERSHIP OF THE ASSOCIATION IN THE WORK AND AIMS OF THE YOUTH CENTRE AND THE BENEFITS OF PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR ALL YOUNG PEOPLE; B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TOWNSEND, BOURNEMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
56
Westover Road
Bournemouth
Christchurch
Dorset
BH1 2BS
- Phone:
- 01202 290451
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window