Financial history UKSG

Charity number: 1093946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £695.44k £195.82k £365.32k £646.63k £685.25k
Total expenditure £591.86k £424.10k £268.13k £536.15k £610.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £521 N/A £11.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £11.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £692.17k N/A N/A £644.12k £657.46k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.27k N/A N/A £1.53k £13.67k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £991 £2.44k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £591.86k N/A N/A £536.15k £610.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.07k N/A N/A £33.06k £36.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0