Governing document UKSG

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/04/2013 as amended on 20 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF LIBRARIANSHIP AND DATA RECALL WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE MANAGEMENT AND CLASSIFICATION OF SERIALS AND SIMILAR PERIODICALS, BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, AND THE CONDUCT OF RESEARCH INTO THE SAID SUBJECT, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.