UNITED WORLD FOUNDATION FOR DEPRIVATION & DISABILITIES EMPOWERMENT (UWFFDADE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects "The Objectives" of the charity shall be to support education and development programmes, arouse awareness, relieve poverty and sickness and promote self esteem and welfare among the deprived: the orphans, widows and the harassed and the disabled in African communities of the United Kingdom and Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
People

18 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Camden
- Greenwich
- Islington
- Lambeth
- Tower Hamlets
- Burundi
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Somalia
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTE KENYANA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAMBI ALLISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
M KITAMIRIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MULINDWA MULINDWA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FLORENCE HENRIETTA KALIKWANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
N RUSSEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR BHATANEHAIT LAKSHMINARAYANA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES KARUHIZE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILSON KAREGYEYA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RUHINDA RUHINDA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JIMMY KISAMBIRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ASHABA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOOR KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUMMER KOBUSINGYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PATRICK MUKWANA-BUSUNGU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELLY KIGOZI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILBERFORCE KAMU HANDA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £4.60k | £4.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.35k | £4.54k | £3.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER AS AMENDED 18 AUGUST 2003, AND 10 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING PEOPLE IN NEED THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE DISABLED, ORPHANS AND DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. 3. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FOR TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 02085176518
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window