ADARA DEVELOPMENT (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adara Development is an international development organisation focussed on improving health and education for women, children and their communities living in poverty. We are experts in maternal, newborn and child health; remote and rural community development. We reach hundreds of thousands of people living in poverty each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nepal
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 23 June 2003: Standard registration
- ADARA(UK) (Working name)
- ISIS (UK) (Previous name)
- THE ISIS FOUNDATION (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AUDETTE EVELYN EXEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Derek Stapley | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
KATE VACHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.54k | £276.20k | £256.81k | £209.19k | £166.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.96k | £225.58k | £245.64k | £188.61k | £216.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 JUNE 2003, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 JUNE 2010, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 FEBRUARY 2011 AND AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2014.
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 3) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN PARTICULAR, ALONE OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS, (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE OBJECTS LISTED ABOVE): A) INITIATE HEALTHCARE PROJECTS IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES; B) PROMOTE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE AID IN THE FIELDS OF NUTRITION, MATERNAL CARE, IMMUNISATION AND CLEAN WATER; C) PROCURE ESSENTIAL DRUGS AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES; D) PROCURE ESSENTIAL DRUGS AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES; E) EDUCATE AND TRAIN HEALTHCARE WORKERS TO PROVIDE HEALTHCARE SERVICES; F) FUND CHILDREN'S HOMES AND SCHOOLS. G) ESTABLISH, SUPPORT OR TRANSFER FUNDS TO ANY CHARITABLE TRUST, CHARITABLE COMPANY OR OTHER ASSOCIATION OR INSTITUTION WHICH IS FORMED FOR ANY OF THE OBJECTS IN 1 TO 3 ABOVE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level 2
117 Harrington Street
The Rocks
NSW 2000
- Phone:
- 61293952800
- Email:
- finance@adaragroup.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window