USWORTH COLLIERY PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's Discos, Christmas Raffle, Christmas Fair, Easter Raffle, Summer Fair, Summer Raffle, Childrens Entertainer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sunderland
Governance
- 19 June 2002: Standard registration
- 23 June 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £3.81k | £3.68k | £3.02k | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.27k | £4.68k | £3.56k | £3.14k | £3.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 11 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 11 March 2009 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 08 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 21 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 29 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
USWORTH COLLIERY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window