Financial history BARNSLEY ALCOHOL AND DRUG ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity number: 1097299
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £1.44m £1.56m £220.18k £139.91k £103.59k
Total expenditure £1.40m £1.65m £489.12k £476.24k £230.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £175.32k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.56m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £13.45k £1.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.64m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.53k £7.32k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £166.44k £0 N/A N/A N/A