RICHMOND LEGAL ADVICE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RICHMOND LEGAL ADVICE SERVICE AIMS TO PROVIDE CLIENTS WITH INITIAL AND BASIC LEGAL ADVICE, FREE OF CHARGE, WITH THE ADVICE BEING PROVIDED ONLY BY LEGALLY QUALIFIED VOLUNTEERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA BIDDULPH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fadi Farhat | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES JOHN COOK | Trustee | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRUCE GORDON MACGREGOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.29k | £35 | £35 | £3.32k | £1.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") IS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL SERVICES TO THOSE PERSONS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD SUCH LEGAL SERVICES AT ALL OR WHO CANNOT PAY FOR LEGAL SERVICES AT THE FINANCIAL RATES ON OFFER TO THEM, WHETHER SUCH INABILITY TO PAY IS PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - RICHMOND
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Vineyard Mews
Preston Place
RICHMOND
TW10 6DD
- Phone:
- 07930 405 336
- Email:
- rlas@rlas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window