Accounts and annual returns EROSH, THE NATIONAL CONSORTIUM FOR SHELTERED HOUSING
Charity number: 1098050
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 January 2016 | 18 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 January 2016 | 18 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 18 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2014
(These accounts |
15 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 08 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 08 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 18 April 2013 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window