THE FRIENDS OF EASTWICK SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events both parent and child led on behalf of the Infant and Junior schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 August 2002: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF EASTWICK INFANT SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Penston | Chair | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Susan Henning | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelley Ann Sweetman | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Scattergood | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.63k | £37.31k | £25.46k | £62.22k | £52.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.13k | £36.77k | £18.82k | £58.44k | £69.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EASTWICK INFANT SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eastwick County Infant School
Eastwick Drive
Bookham
Leatherhead
KT23 3PP
- Phone:
- 01372453672
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window