LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advising, assisting and supporting all existing Watches, and the setting up of new Watches, in the London Borough of Hounslow. The actual activities vary from time to time in accordance with needs and circumstances, but currently include seeking and obtaining funding, obtaining and distributing street signs, window stickers and information/advice leaflets, and organising "Knowledge Evenings".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- 24 June 2002: Standard registration
- HOUNSLOW BOROUGH NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- HOUNSLOW NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WINSTON GORDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Barbara Stryjak | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Kassem | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lata Dhiri | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marija Kosanovic | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Minoo Dhiri | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Khulique MALIK | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9 | £8 | £5.61k | £5 | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £998 | £3.29k | £362 | £452 | £2.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 820 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1185 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1550 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREAT PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME SO THAT EFFECTIVE LIAISON BETWEEN THE POLICE, OTHER COMMUNITY SAFETY GROUPS AND THE PUBLIC CAN BE ACHIEVED IN ORDER TO REDUCE CRIME RATE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW. 2. TO FACILITATE CONSULTATION ARRANGEMENTS WITH WATCHES IN THE BOROUGH THAT MAY BE INITIATED BY THE COMMUNITY SAFETY PARTNERSHIP TO DISCHARGE ITS RESPONSIBILITIES UNDER THE CRIME AND DISORDER ACT 1998.
Area of benefit
HOUNSLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
156 WOODLAND GARDENS
ISLEWORTH
TW7 6LR
- Phone:
- 07961384689
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window