BUNTINGFORD ACTION FOR THE LESS ABLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run 1 mini bus that has the capacity for 2 wheel chairs and 9 passengers. We organise trips shopping, theatre, London, museums etc for local disabled people. We organise coffee mornings, soup lunches and cream teas during the year. We also provide small grants to deserving cases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 October 2002: Standard registration
- B.A.L.A. (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA EASLEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Joanne McNamara | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Valerie Sievert | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUTH VINCENT | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phyllis Sheila Clark | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.84k | £467 | £1.35k | £2.55k | £6.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.96k | £4.43k | £5.70k | £4.84k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2021 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED 19TH OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES IN THE TOWN OF BUNTINGFORD AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF, AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, SERVICES, GRANTS, EVENT AND FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
BUNTINGFORD AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
70A High Street
BUNTINGFORD
Herts
SG9 9AH
- Phone:
- 01763273623
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window