Financial history MALARCHI POONCHOLAI TRUST

Charity Number: 1092994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £231.24k £20.07k £202.95k £41.79k £2.03k
Total expenditure £42.17k £48.90k £44.31k £96.33k £73.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A