ST. BARNABAS (HADLEIGH) PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 21 August 2002: Standard registration
- 20 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 May 2016: Funds transferred to 1159837 BARNY BUS PRESCHOOL
- ST. BARNABAS PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.23k | £82.09k | £62.15k | £65.72k | £68.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.41k | £78.46k | £61.12k | £59.36k | £67.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 03 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2014
(These accounts |
03 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 02 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 02 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 13 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRE-SCHOOL CONSTITUTION DATED 19 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY. (PLEASE SEE COPY OF CONSTITUTION ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
ESSEX - CASTLE POINT - ST. BARNABAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window