PERSPECTIVES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of children and young people with physical or learning difficulties, their families and carers in and around St. Petersburg, Russia by providing or assisting with the provision of items, facilities, equipment or other resources which would not otherwise be provided put of statutory funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Russia
Governance
- 22 October 2002: Standard registration
- 25 April 2022: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.82k | £26.04k | £28.48k | £25.78k | £18.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.12k | £27.20k | £25.96k | £27.02k | £28.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 1 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES. THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN AND AROUND ST PETERSBURG, RUSSIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT OR OTHER RESOURCES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED OUT OF STATUTORY FUNDING.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window