6TH HAYES (ST RAPHAEL'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Scout Group within the Hillingdon Borough. We have a Beaver, Cubs and a Scout section. We meet on various nights within the week and follow a detailed programme of activities relating to the environment, social communication, and pursuits of leisure and life skills, some of the topics we cover throughout the year. We also engage with other colonies in the Hayes and Harlington District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 27 June 2002: Standard registration
- ST. RAPHAEL'S SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Cox | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mona Mohammed | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAEVE O'CONNOR | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Beuca | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Henson | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.78k | £4.38k | £24.77k | £4.85k | £5.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.45k | £2.23k | £4.90k | £6.83k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.58k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28/03/1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18/02/1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19/07/1991 AS AMENDED ON 13/12/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
233 KINGSHILL AVENUE
HAYES
UB4 8BL
- Phone:
- 02085819553
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window