Financial history ANIMAL RESCUE CYPRUS (ARC)

Charity number: 1096482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £29.80k £31.26k £7.32k £643 £10.04k
Total expenditure £40.97k £35.66k £11.19k £1.30k £8.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A