THE TIKVAH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To meet the needs of the very poorest in one of the poorest areas of the world, mainly South Asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Burma
- Cambodia
- China
- Indonesia
- Laos
- Malaysia
- Philippines
- Vietnam
Governance
- 07 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Charles Hull | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Madeleine Turner | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sam Grady Dowding | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN KELLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS MAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J KELLARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.69k | £63.03k | £75.76k | £49.39k | £46.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.27k | £136.11k | £124.74k | £117.08k | £210.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2020
(These accounts |
29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2019
(These accounts |
30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS 2) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
The Orchard
12 Balcombe Road
Branksome Park
POOLE
- Phone:
- 01202765798
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window