Financial history MASJID AND MADRESSA TALEEM-UL-ISLAM

Charity number: 1098101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.10k £39.40k £51.13k £46.02k £46.80k
Total expenditure £33.88k £20.31k £46.81k £42.66k £42.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.57k N/A N/A N/A