MASJID AND MADRESSA TALEEM-UL-ISLAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF PRAYER FACILITIES FOR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN BLACKBURN AND PART TIME RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IS PROVIDED TO CHILDREN IN THE LOCAL AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 19 June 2003: Standard registration
- MADRESSA TALEEM-UL-ISLAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shahid Mahmood | Chair | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Akhtar Ali | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mazhar Iqbal | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Talib Hussain | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.10k | £39.40k | £51.13k | £46.02k | £46.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.88k | £20.31k | £46.81k | £42.66k | £42.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2018 as amended on 13 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QU'RAN AS EXEMPLIFIED BY THE IDEAL LIFE OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMED (PEACE BE UPON HIM) BASED ON THE PRINCIPLES OF AHLE-SUNNATUL-JAMAAT AND THE TABLIGHI PRINCIPLES OBSERVED AND PRACTISED BY DARUL-ULOOM DEOBAND (UNIVERSITY) IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-15 COBWELL
WHALLEY OLD ROAD
BLACKBURN
BB1 7JJ
- Phone:
- 07866 742084
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window