Financial history FRIENDS OF YOUNG CARERS (SWINDON)

Charity Number: 1094276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.33k £54.39k £79.36k £69.65k £78.53k
Total expenditure £70.61k £23.28k £61.61k £67.96k £71.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A