FRIENDS OF YOUNG CARERS (SWINDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The focus of the charity's work is to provide help and support to children and young people caring for a member of their family who may be disabled or suffering from mental health problems , substance misuse or have a long term or terminal illness. Young carers benefit by being involved in a range of activities to have a break from their caring responsibilities and regain their childhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Swindon
Governance
- 22 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN PRICE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Julie Collar | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Slade | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Stevens | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENISE STEVENS | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR JERRY GRAYBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN ELIZABETH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALLAN ANTHONY HENEGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.33k | £54.39k | £79.36k | £69.65k | £78.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.61k | £23.28k | £61.61k | £67.96k | £71.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF YOUNG CARERS IN SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (YOUNG CARERS BEING DEFINED AS PERSONS UP TO 25 YEARS OF AGE WHOSE LIVES ARE AFFECTED IN SOME WAY BECAUSE OF THE NEED TO CARE FOR SOMEONE AT HOME), WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, ETHNICITY, RACE, COLOUR, DISABILITY, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS, BY ASSOCIATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND THE LOCAL INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: (A) PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS; (B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION; AND (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 High Street
Cricklade
SWINDON
SN6 6DA
- Phone:
- 07957401153
- Email:
- allan.heneghan@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window