Financial history ALDERTON VILLAGE HALL (WILTSHIRE)

Charity number: 1105440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.14k £0 £780 £767 £1.34k
Total expenditure £831 £832 £490 £1.39k £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A